EP0511501 - Device for power transmission in construction toys [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - applicant | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states fischerwerke Artur Fischer GmbH & Co. KG Weinhalde 14-18 72178 Waldachtal / DE | [2009/50] |
Former [1992/45] | For all designated states fischerwerke Artur Fischer GmbH & Co. KG Weinhalde 14 - 18 D-72178 Waldachtal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weber, Wilfried, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Am Stücklesberg 10 W-7294 Schopfloch-Unteriflingen / DE | [1992/45] | Application number, filing date | 92105500.0 | 31.03.1992 | [1992/45] | Priority number, date | DE19914114109 | 30.04.1991 Original published format: DE 4114109 | [1992/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0511501 | Date: | 04.11.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A63H33/04, A63H31/10 | [1992/45] | CPC: |
A63H31/10 (EP);
A63H33/042 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1992/45] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Kraftübertragung in Spielzeugmodellen | [1992/45] | English: | Device for power transmission in construction toys | [1992/45] | French: | Dispositif pour transport de force dans les jeux de construction | [1992/45] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 18.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/20] | 21.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/04] | 31.08.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4690656 ; | [Y]EP0170620 |