EP0510392 - Process for the preparation of easily dispersable pigment granules [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.01.1998 [1998/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/44] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roth, Karl Albert-Schweitzer-Strasse 33 W-6703 Limburgerhof / DE | [1992/44] | Application number, filing date | 92105575.2 | 01.04.1992 | [1992/44] | Priority number, date | DE19914113318 | 24.04.1991 Original published format: DE 4113318 | [1992/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0510392 | Date: | 28.10.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0510392 | Date: | 22.01.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C09B67/20 | [1992/44] | CPC: |
C09B67/0095 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI [1992/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von leicht dispergierbaren Pigmentgranulaten | [1992/44] | English: | Process for the preparation of easily dispersable pigment granules | [1992/44] | French: | Procédé de préparation de granulés de pigment facilement dispersables | [1992/44] | Examination procedure | 20.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/16] | 23.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60208761 ; | [X]FR2194755 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [A]FR2332052 (BAYER AG [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 68 (P-437)(2125) 18. März 1986 & JP-A-60 208 761 ( CANON ) 21. Oktober 1985, & JP60208761 A 00000000 |