EP0507280 - Apparatus for inserting and withdrawing coil tubing into a well [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.1997 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STEWART & STEVENSON SERVICES, INC. P.O. Box 1637 Houston Texas 77251-1637 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/41] | For all designated states STEWART & STEVENSON SERVICES, INC. P.O. Box 1637 Houston Texas 77251-1637 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anderson, William Leland Jr. 3245 Huntington Place Houston, Texas 77019 / US | [1992/41] | Representative(s) | Schwan, Gerhard Schwan Schwan Schorer Patentanwälte Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/41] | Schwan, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Elfenstrasse 32 D-81739 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92105620.6 | 01.04.1992 | [1992/41] | Priority number, date | US19910679733 | 03.04.1991 Original published format: US 679733 | [1992/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0507280 | Date: | 07.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0507280 | Date: | 13.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | E21B19/22 | [1992/41] | CPC: |
E21B19/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1992/41] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Einführen und Herausziehen eines gewickelten Rohrstranges im Bohrloch | [1992/41] | English: | Apparatus for inserting and withdrawing coil tubing into a well | [1992/41] | French: | Dispositif pour introduire et extraire un tubage enroulé dans un puits | [1992/41] | Examination procedure | 08.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/14] | 24.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.03.1996 | BE | 13.03.1996 | CH | 13.03.1996 | DK | 13.03.1996 | ES | 13.03.1996 | FR | 13.03.1996 | GR | 13.03.1996 | IT | 13.03.1996 | LI | 13.03.1996 | NL | 13.03.1996 | LU | 30.04.1996 | MC | 30.04.1996 | SE | 13.06.1996 | DE | 14.06.1996 | PT | 14.06.1996 | [2006/45] |
Former [2004/35] | AT | 13.03.1996 | |
BE | 13.03.1996 | ||
CH | 13.03.1996 | ||
DK | 13.03.1996 | ||
ES | 13.03.1996 | ||
FR | 13.03.1996 | ||
GR | 13.03.1996 | ||
IT | 13.03.1996 | ||
LI | 13.03.1996 | ||
NL | 13.03.1996 | ||
LU | 30.04.1996 | ||
SE | 13.06.1996 | ||
DE | 14.06.1996 | ||
PT | 14.06.1996 | ||
Former [2003/07] | AT | 13.03.1996 | |
BE | 13.03.1996 | ||
CH | 13.03.1996 | ||
DK | 13.03.1996 | ||
ES | 13.03.1996 | ||
GR | 13.03.1996 | ||
IT | 13.03.1996 | ||
LI | 13.03.1996 | ||
NL | 13.03.1996 | ||
LU | 30.04.1996 | ||
SE | 13.06.1996 | ||
DE | 14.06.1996 | ||
PT | 14.06.1996 | ||
FR | 09.08.1996 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 13.03.1996 | |
BE | 13.03.1996 | ||
CH | 13.03.1996 | ||
DK | 13.03.1996 | ||
ES | 13.03.1996 | ||
GR | 13.03.1996 | ||
IT | 13.03.1996 | ||
LI | 13.03.1996 | ||
LU | 30.04.1996 | ||
SE | 13.06.1996 | ||
DE | 14.06.1996 | ||
PT | 14.06.1996 | ||
FR | 09.08.1996 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 13.03.1996 | |
BE | 13.03.1996 | ||
CH | 13.03.1996 | ||
DK | 13.03.1996 | ||
GR | 13.03.1996 | ||
IT | 13.03.1996 | ||
LI | 13.03.1996 | ||
LU | 30.04.1996 | ||
SE | 13.06.1996 | ||
DE | 14.06.1996 | ||
PT | 14.06.1996 | ||
FR | 09.08.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 13.03.1996 | |
BE | 13.03.1996 | ||
CH | 13.03.1996 | ||
DK | 13.03.1996 | ||
IT | 13.03.1996 | ||
LI | 13.03.1996 | ||
SE | 13.06.1996 | ||
DE | 14.06.1996 | ||
PT | 14.06.1996 | ||
FR | 09.08.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 13.03.1996 | |
BE | 13.03.1996 | ||
CH | 13.03.1996 | ||
DK | 13.03.1996 | ||
LI | 13.03.1996 | ||
SE | 13.06.1996 | ||
DE | 14.06.1996 | ||
PT | 14.06.1996 | ||
FR | 09.08.1996 | ||
Former [1998/14] | AT | 13.03.1996 | |
BE | 13.03.1996 | ||
CH | 13.03.1996 | ||
LI | 13.03.1996 | ||
SE | 13.06.1996 | ||
DE | 14.06.1996 | ||
PT | 14.06.1996 | ||
FR | 09.08.1996 | ||
Former [1998/04] | AT | 13.03.1996 | |
BE | 13.03.1996 | ||
CH | 13.03.1996 | ||
LI | 13.03.1996 | ||
SE | 13.06.1996 | ||
DE | 14.06.1996 | ||
FR | 09.08.1996 | ||
Former [1997/12] | AT | 13.03.1996 | |
BE | 13.03.1996 | ||
SE | 13.06.1996 | ||
DE | 14.06.1996 | ||
FR | 09.08.1996 | ||
Former [1997/03] | AT | 13.03.1996 | |
BE | 13.03.1996 | ||
SE | 13.06.1996 | ||
DE | 14.06.1996 | ||
Former [1996/52] | BE | 13.03.1996 | |
SE | 13.06.1996 | ||
DE | 14.06.1996 | ||
Former [1996/44] | SE | 13.06.1996 | |
DE | 14.06.1996 | ||
Former [N/P] | deleted | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3285485 (SLATOR DAMON T); | [A]US3866882 (WILLM YVES, et al); | [AD]US4585061 (LYONS JR ROBERT A [US], et al); | [A]GB2180869 (OTIS ENG CO) |