Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.07.1996 [1996/30] |
16.06.1995 | (Expected) grant | published on 02.08.1995 [1995/31] |
18.08.1994 | First examination report | |
17.05.1993 | Request for examination filed | published on 07.07.1993 [1993/27] |
02.03.1993 | Publication of search report | published on 21.04.1993 [1993/16] |
28.08.1992 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 14.10.1992 [1992/42] |