EP0507287 - Processes for preparing hydrogen gas and determining ratio of masses between hydrogen isotopes therein [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.11.1996 [1996/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 6-1, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/41] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 6-1, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ueda, Akira, c/o Chuo-Kenkyusho Mitsubishi Materials Corp., 1-297, Kitabukuro-cho Omiya-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Kubota, Yasuhiro, c/o Chuo-Kenkyusho Mitsubishi Materials Corp., 1-297, Kitabukuro-cho Omiya-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Araki, Tsutomu, c/o Naoshima-Seirensho Mitsubishi Materials Corp., 4049-1, Naoshima-cho Kagawa-gun, Kagawa-ken / JP | [1992/41] | Representative(s) | Hrabal, Ulrich, et al Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/33] | Hrabal, Ulrich, Dr., et al Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1992/41] | Türk, Dietmar, Dr. rer. nat. Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 92105643.8 | 02.04.1992 | [1992/41] | Priority number, date | JP19910071918 | 04.04.1991 Original published format: JP 7191891 | JP19910080206 | 12.04.1991 Original published format: JP 8020691 | [1992/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0507287 | Date: | 07.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0507287 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0507287 | Date: | 29.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C01B3/08, G01N27/00, C01B3/10 | [1993/09] | CPC: |
C01B4/00 (EP,US);
C01B3/06 (EP,US);
H01J49/04 (EP,US);
Y02E60/36 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/41] | C01B3/08, G01N27/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/41] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Wasserstoffgas und Verfahren zum Bestimmen des Massenverhältnisses zwischen den Wasserstoffisotopen | [1992/41] | English: | Processes for preparing hydrogen gas and determining ratio of masses between hydrogen isotopes therein | [1992/41] | French: | Procédé de préparation de gaz hydrogène et procédé pour déterminer les rapports massiques entre les différents isotopes de l'hydrogène | [1992/41] | Examination procedure | 08.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/27] | 07.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 29.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - ANAL. CHEM. vol. 54, 1982, pages 993 - 995 COLEMAN ET AL 'reduction of water with zinc for hydrogen isotope analysis' | [A] - ANAL. CHEM. vol. 57, no. 7, 1985, pages 1437 - 1440 KENDALL ET AL 'Multisample conversion of water to hydrogen by zinc for stable isotope determination' | [AD] - ANAL. CHEM. vol. 24, 1952, pages 1356 - 1357 BIGELEISEN ET AL 'Conversion of hydrogenic materialsto hydrogen for isotopic analysis' |