EP0507299 - Loosely coupled multiplexing control apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/41] | Loosely coupled multiplexing control apparatus and method | ||
[1998/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.1999 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.07.1999 [1999/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/41] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Nobuhisa 63-41, Tabiko Katsuta-shi / JP | 02 /
Tashiro, Korefumi 5-1, Omikacho-6-chome Hitachi-shi / JP | 03 /
Nohmi, Makoto 3-3-1-317, Sakado, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi / JP | [1992/41] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/41] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92105695.8 | 02.04.1992 | [1992/41] | Priority number, date | JP19910072774 | 05.04.1991 Original published format: JP 7277491 | [1992/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0507299 | Date: | 07.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0507299 | Date: | 17.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0507299 | Date: | 15.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16, G06F11/18 | [1994/34] | CPC: |
G06F11/181 (EP);
G06F11/182 (EP);
G06F15/17 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/41] | G06F15/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [1992/41] | Title | German: | Lose gekoppelte Multiplex-Steuervorrichtung | [1998/29] | English: | Loosely coupled multiplexing control apparatus | [1998/29] | French: | Appareil de contrôle d'un multiplexage couplé lâche | [1998/29] |
Former [1992/41] | Apparat und Verfahren zum Steuern eines lose gekoppelten Multiplexers | ||
Former [1992/41] | Loosely coupled multiplexing control apparatus and method | ||
Former [1992/41] | Appareil et méthode de contrôle d'un multiplexage couplé lâche | Examination procedure | 23.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/47] | 17.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 15.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4667284 (K. ASAMI) [X] 1-7 * column 2, line 1 - column 4, line 22 * * column 5, line 10 - column 9, line 40 * * figure - *; | [X]WO8707793 (PULLI) [X] 1-7 * the whole document * | [X] - K. ASAMI, "super-high reliability fault tolerant system NURECS-3000", PROCEEDINGS IECON'84, KEIO INTERNATIONAL CONTINETAL HOTEL TOKYO, JAPAN, (19841022), pages 1181 - 1184 [X] 1-7 * the whole document * |