EP0508373 - Total containment welding of plastic tubes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENCO, INC. 501 Silverside Road, Suite 36 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | [1992/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spencer, Dudley W.C. 619 Shipley Road Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | 02 /
Shaposka, John B. 2608 Dean Drive Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | [1992/42] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/11] | Wagner, Karl H. WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/42] | Wagner, Karl H. WAGNER & GEYER, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92105994.5 | 07.04.1992 | [1992/42] | Priority number, date | US19910682977 | 10.04.1991 Original published format: US 682977 | [1992/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0508373 | Date: | 14.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0508373 | Date: | 26.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0508373 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B29C65/20, A61M39/00, // B29L23/22 | [1994/04] | CPC: |
A61M39/146 (EP,US);
B29C65/2046 (EP,US);
B29C65/7841 (EP);
B29C66/0018 (EP);
B29C66/032 (EP,US);
B29C66/0324 (EP,US);
B29C66/1142 (EP,US);
B29C66/326 (EP,US);
B29C66/3282 (EP,US);
B29C66/5221 (EP,US);
B29C66/7373 (EP);
B29C66/73921 (EP);
B29C66/80 (EP,US);
B29C66/857 (EP,US);
B29C66/8762 (EP,US);
B29L2023/005 (EP,US);
B29L2023/007 (EP,US);
B29L2023/22 (EP,US);
B29L2031/753 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1054 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1066 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1992/42] | B29C65/20, A61M39/00, // B29L23:22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1992/42] | Title | German: | Steriles Schweissen von Kunststoffschläuchen | [1992/42] | English: | Total containment welding of plastic tubes | [1992/42] | French: | Soudage stérile de tuyaux en matière plastique | [1992/42] | Examination procedure | 26.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/38] | 24.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48] | Request for further processing for: | 13.01.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 13.01.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.01.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2001 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   06.06.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.12.2001 | CH | 05.12.2001 | GR | 05.12.2001 | IT | 05.12.2001 | LI | 05.12.2001 | PT | 05.03.2002 | ES | 27.06.2002 | [2008/02] |
Former [2004/04] | AT | 05.12.2001 | |
CH | 05.12.2001 | ||
GR | 05.12.2001 | ||
LI | 05.12.2001 | ||
PT | 05.03.2002 | ||
ES | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 05.12.2001 | |
CH | 05.12.2001 | ||
GR | 05.12.2001 | ||
LI | 05.12.2001 | ||
PT | 05.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 05.12.2001 | |
GR | 05.12.2001 | ||
LI | 05.12.2001 | ||
PT | 05.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | GR | 05.12.2001 | |
PT | 05.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | PT | 05.03.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB917373 (RESIFLEX LAB INC) [A] 1,9 * page 2, line 33 - line 36; figure 6 *; | [A]DE2250130 (HENKE DIETER) [A] 9* figure -; claim 1 *; | [YA]FR2473406 (MONI PAUL [FR]) [Y] 2,6 * figure 6; claims 1,2,4,5 * [A] 5; | [Y]EP0208004 (NPBI BV [NL]) [Y] 9 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [Y]DE8715223U (BUNDESREPUBLIK DEUTSCHLAND) [Y] 3,4; | [DXY]US4753697 (SHAPOSKA JOHN B [US], et al) [DX] 1,5,8 * figures 10-13,17-20 * [Y] 2-4,6,9; | [DA]US4793880 (SHAPOSKA JOHN B [US], et al) [DA] * figures 17,24,25 * |