EP0508474 - Total containment welding of plastic tube [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENCO, INC. 501 Silverside Road, Suite 36 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | [1992/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spencer, Dudley W. C. 619 Shipley Road Wilmington, Delaware 19803 / US | 02 /
Shaposka, John B. 2608 Dean Drive Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | 03 /
Beird, Robert J. 3314 Old Capitol Trail Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | [1992/42] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/11] | Wagner, Karl H., et al WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/42] | Wagner, Karl H. WAGNER & GEYER, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92106287.3 | 10.04.1992 | [1992/42] | Priority number, date | US19910764249 | 23.09.1991 Original published format: US 764249 | US19910682977 | 10.04.1991 Original published format: US 682977 | [1992/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0508474 | Date: | 14.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0508474 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0508474 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B29C65/20, B29C65/74, B29C57/10, A61M39/00, // B29L23/22 | [1994/07] | CPC: |
B29C66/032 (EP,US);
A61M39/146 (EP,US);
B29C57/10 (EP,US);
B29C65/203 (EP,US);
B29C65/2046 (EP,US);
B29C65/2061 (EP,US);
B29C65/7802 (EP,US);
B29C65/7841 (EP);
B29C66/0018 (EP);
B29C66/0324 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/1142 (EP,US);
B29C66/326 (EP,US);
B29C66/3282 (EP,US);
B29C66/3494 (EP,US);
B29C66/43 (EP,US);
B29C66/4312 (EP,US);
B29C66/5221 (EP,US);
B29C66/7373 (EP);
B29C66/73921 (EP);
B29C66/80 (EP,US);
B29C66/857 (EP,US);
B29C66/8762 (EP,US);
B29C66/0042 (EP);
B29C66/137 (EP);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29C66/8122 (EP);
B29L2023/005 (EP,US);
B29L2023/006 (EP,US);
B29L2023/007 (EP,US);
B29L2023/22 (EP,US);
B29L2031/753 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1054 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1066 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1313 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1326 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1378 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2027/06 (EP,US);
B29C66/8122, B29K2827/18 (EP) |
Former IPC [1992/42] | B29C65/20, A61M39/00, // B29L23:22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1992/42] | Title | German: | Steriles Schweissen von Kunststoffschläuchen | [1992/42] | English: | Total containment welding of plastic tube | [1992/42] | French: | Soudage stérile de tuyaux en matière plastique | [1992/42] | Examination procedure | 20.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/48] | 10.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02008307.7 / EP1238782 | Opposition(s) | 03.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2001 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   06.06.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.10.2002 | CH | 02.10.2002 | GR | 02.10.2002 | IT | 02.10.2002 | LI | 02.10.2002 | PT | 02.01.2003 | LU | 10.04.2003 | ES | 29.04.2003 | MC | 30.04.2003 | [2008/02] |
Former [2005/02] | AT | 02.10.2002 | |
CH | 02.10.2002 | ||
GR | 02.10.2002 | ||
LI | 02.10.2002 | ||
PT | 02.01.2003 | ||
LU | 10.04.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
MC | 30.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 02.10.2002 | |
CH | 02.10.2002 | ||
GR | 02.10.2002 | ||
LI | 02.10.2002 | ||
PT | 02.01.2003 | ||
LU | 10.04.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 02.10.2002 | |
CH | 02.10.2002 | ||
GR | 02.10.2002 | ||
LI | 02.10.2002 | ||
PT | 02.01.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/39] | AT | 02.10.2002 | |
CH | 02.10.2002 | ||
GR | 02.10.2002 | ||
LI | 02.10.2002 | ||
PT | 02.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/37] | AT | 02.10.2002 | |
GR | 02.10.2002 | ||
PT | 02.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 02.10.2002 | |
PT | 02.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | PT | 02.01.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]BE594760 (L. SPRUIT) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [YA]US2562523 (GASTON BRUNET) [Y] 2,3,6-8 * figures 6-8 * [A] 9; | [A]CH375515 (HESSER AG MASCHF [DE]) [A] 2,3,6,9 * figures 2,3 *; | [A]US3413175 (KURT ROCHLA) [A] 1 * figures 13-16 *; | [A]US3968195 (BISHOP MARILYN) [A] 4,10 * abstract *; | [A]WO8301926 (YOUNG WILLIAM EDMUND, et al) [A] 1 * page 9, line 19 - page 10, line 9; figure - ** page 12, line 21 - page 13, line 14 *; | [A]US4443215 (SMITH JAMES G [US]) [A] 2,3,6,7 * abstract *; | [A]EP0134630 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 4,10 * figures 8,9; claim 1 *; | [Y]EP0208004 (NPBI BV [NL]) [Y] 4,10 * figure - *; | [YA]US4753697 (SHAPOSKA JOHN B [US], et al) [Y] 4,10 * figures 6,17-20 * [A] 2,3,6,7; | [A]US4770735 (SHAPOSKA JOHN B [US], et al) [A] 4,10 * figures 8-11 *; | [XY]US4897138 (SHAPOSKA JOHN B [US], et al) [X] 1,5 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,6-8 |