EP0509423 - Optical recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.05.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.1998 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 21.10.1998 [1998/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS, Inc. 2-5 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/43] | For all designated states MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS, Inc. 2-5 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koike, Tadashi 5-45, Dai 4-chome Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Mizukuki, Tadahiko 37-4, Adachi 4-chome Adachi-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Sasakawa, Tomoyoshi 14-7-702, Takasu 1-chome Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | 04 /
Suzuki, Yuko 2070-3-29, Iijima-machi, Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 05 /
Shiina, Kouichi 2957, Nase-Machi, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [1992/43] | Representative(s) | Mai, Oppermann & Partner i.L. Patentanwälte Postfach 3929 65029 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/44] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR Patentanwälte, Postfach 3929 65029 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1992/43] | Schüler, Horst, Dr. Patentanwalt, Kaiserstrasse 69 D-60329 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 92106324.4 | 12.04.1992 | [1992/43] | Priority number, date | JP19910083784 | 16.04.1991 Original published format: JP 8378491 | [1992/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0509423 | Date: | 21.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0509423 | Date: | 02.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/24, G11B7/26 | [1992/43] | CPC: |
G11B7/0938 (EP,US);
G11B7/24027 (KR);
G11B7/24 (EP,US);
G11B7/24079 (EP,US);
G11B7/248 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1992/43] | Title | German: | Optischer Aufzeichnungsträger | [1992/43] | English: | Optical recording medium | [1992/43] | French: | Milieu d'enregistrement optique | [1992/43] | Examination procedure | 20.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/43] | 06.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 03.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 02.07.1997 | LI | 02.07.1997 | [1998/43] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4359750 (HOWE DENNIS G); | [AD]EP0410183 (TAIYO YUDEN KK [JP]); | [A]EP0368442 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) |