EP0511551 - Method and apparatus for making ring-core coins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.03.1997 [1997/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHULER PRESSEN GmbH & Co. Bahnhofstrasse 41 73033 Göppingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/17] | For all designated states SCHULER PRESSEN GmbH & Co. Bahnhofstrasse 41 D-73033 Göppingen / DE | ||
Former [1992/45] | For all designated states L. SCHULER GmbH Postfach 12 22 D-73012 Göppingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dangelmaier, Karl Glockenweg 13 W-7320 Göppingen / DE | [1992/45] | Application number, filing date | 92106510.8 | 15.04.1992 | [1992/45] | Priority number, date | DE19914113971 | 29.04.1991 Original published format: DE 4113971 | [1992/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0511551 | Date: | 04.11.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0511551 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B44B5/00, B44B5/02, B23P19/08, B21D43/14 | [1992/45] | CPC: |
B21D43/14 (EP);
B44B5/008 (EP);
B44B5/009 (EP);
B44B5/024 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zum Fertigen von Ring-Kern-Münzen | [1992/45] | English: | Method and apparatus for making ring-core coins | [1992/45] | French: | Méthode et dispositif de réalisation des pièces anneau-noyau | [1992/45] | Examination procedure | 24.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/34] | 15.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.06.1993 | M01   Fee paid on   24.06.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP51142772 ; | [AD]DE3742745 (SCHULER GMBH L [DE]); | [A]EP0160343 (DELTASIDER SPA [IT]); | [A]US2644178 (NIELSEN MORITZ H); | [A]US4287748 (WOLFTHAL MAURICE) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 001, no. 025 (M-013)26. März 1977 & JP-A-51 142 772 ( MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO K.K. ) 12. August 1976 & JP-A-51 142 772, & JP51142772 A 00000000 |