EP0513553 - Methods and apparatus providing for a multimedia authoring and presentation system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.1998 [1998/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ESCOM AG Burgstrasse 27-31 44867 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/37] | For all designated states ESCOM AG Burgstrasse 27-31 D-44867 Bochum / DE | ||
Former [1992/47] | For all designated states COMMODORE ELECTRONICS LIMITED P.O. Box N10256 Sassoon House Shirley and Victoria Street Nassau / BS | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gerlach, John D., Jr. 3615 Barcroft View Terrace, Nr. 104 Falls Church, VA 22041 / US | 02 /
Kannan, Narashimahan P. 1316 Kurth Road McLean, VA 22101 / US | 03 /
Lutz, Wayne D. 902 Lira Drive Fort Washington, MA 20744 / US | 04 /
Nicotra, Christopher G. 11577 Running Cedar Road Reston, VA 22091 / US | 05 /
Weiblen, Michael E. 4809 Calvert Road College Park, MS 20740 / US | [1992/47] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1997/21] |
Former [1995/41] | Dr. Fuchs, Dr. Luderschmidt Dr. Mehler, Dipl.-Ing Weiss Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 D-65036 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1992/47] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92106693.2 | 16.04.1992 | [1992/47] | Priority number, date | US19910691865 | 26.04.1991 Original published format: US 691865 | US19910691965 | 26.04.1991 Original published format: US 691965 | US19910691984 | 26.04.1991 Original published format: US 691984 | US19910692230 | 26.04.1991 Original published format: US 692230 | [1992/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0513553 | Date: | 19.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0513553 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44, H04N1/00 | [1993/23] | CPC: |
G11B27/034 (EP);
G06F40/151 (EP);
G06F40/166 (EP);
G09B7/04 (EP);
G11B27/34 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/47] | G06F9/44 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1992/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Entwurf und Anzeige in einem Multimediensystem | [1992/47] | English: | Methods and apparatus providing for a multimedia authoring and presentation system | [1992/47] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la conception et la présentation dans un système multimedia | [1992/47] | Examination procedure | 24.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/03] | 06.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/33] | 17.03.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1995 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   14.08.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 15.07.1996 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [1997/19] | 27.08.1997 | Resumption of proceedings | [1997/19] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8807719 (AIMTECH CORP [US]) | [A] - IBM 'USING DISK OPERATING SYSTEM VERSION 4.00' July 1988 , FIRST EDITION pages 29 - 31; BACKUP | [A] - BYTE. vol. 15, no. 8, August 1990, ST PETERBOROUGH, US pages 114 - 115 S. MIASTKOWSKI 'WINDOWS SHOPPING, PRICEY AND ELEGANT MULTIMEDIA DEVELOPMENT' | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SOFTWARE ENGINEERING. vol. 16, no. 10, October 1990, NEW YORK, NY, US pages 1178 - 1184 M. HIRAKAWA ET AL. 'AN ICONIC PROGRAMMING SYSTEM, HI-VISUAL' |