EP0557569 - Valve for deformable plastic bottle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SBK SPRITZ-BLAS-KUNSTSTOFF-TECHNIK GmbH & Co. KG Borsigstrasse 14 D-24568 Kaltenkirchen / DE | [1993/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bogumil, Stefan Heidland 8 W-2358 Kaltenkirchen / DE | [1993/35] | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 28 22767 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Diehl & Partner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 28 22767 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1993/35] | DIEHL GLAESER HILTL & PARTNER Patentanwälte Königstrasse 28 D-22767 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 92107091.8 | 25.04.1992 | [1993/35] | Priority number, date | DE19920002380U | 24.02.1992 Original published format: DE 9202380 U | [1993/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0557569 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B65D47/20 | [1993/35] | CPC: |
B65D47/2062 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1993/35] | Title | German: | Ventil für verformbaren Kunststoffbehälter | [1993/35] | English: | Valve for deformable plastic bottle | [1993/35] | French: | Soupape pour bouteille déformable en matière plastique | [1993/35] | File destroyed: | 01.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 02.03.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/44] | 14.06.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/44] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.04.1994 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1994 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4457453 ; | [XE]EP0530789 |