EP0512431 - Method for producing a three-dimensionally shaped textile material and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.12.1997 [1997/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/46] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Disselbeck, Dieter Am Rehsteig 3 W-6232 Bad Soden am Taunus / DE | 02 /
Gebauer, Elke Augsburger Strasse 15e W-8903 Bobingen / DE | [1992/46] | Application number, filing date | 92107436.5 | 30.04.1992 | [1992/46] | Priority number, date | DE19914114571 | 04.05.1991 Original published format: DE 4114571 | [1992/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0512431 | Date: | 11.11.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0512431 | Date: | 18.12.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B29C51/00, B29C70/24, B29D24/00, B29B15/10 | [1996/51] | CPC: |
B29D24/002 (EP,US);
B29B11/16 (EP,US);
B29C51/004 (EP,US);
B29C70/222 (EP,US);
B29C70/465 (EP,US);
B29K2067/00 (EP,US);
B29K2105/08 (EP,US);
B29K2105/206 (EP,US);
B29K2267/00 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1002 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24562 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24628 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24636 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24661 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24942 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3146 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3154 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3285 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1992/46] | B29C51/00, B29C67/14, B29D24/00, B29B15/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1996/35] |
Former [1992/46] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines dreidimensional verformten Textilmaterials und seine Verwendung | [1992/46] | English: | Method for producing a three-dimensionally shaped textile material and its use | [1992/46] | French: | Procédé pour fabriquer un matériau textile déformé tridimensionnellement et son utilisation | [1992/46] | Examination procedure | 14.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/50] | 19.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3614533 (ISPHORDING WALTER [DE]); | [A]EP0324714 (TEXTEC TEXTIL ENG & CONSULT [DE]) |