EP0518045 - Hot melt pressure sensitive adhesives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.1994 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.03.1994 [1994/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FINDLEY ADHESIVES INC. 11320 Watertown Plank Road Wauwatosa Wisconsin 53226-3413 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/51] | For all designated states FINDLEY ADHESIVES INC. 11320 Watertown Plank Road Wauwatosa Wisconsin 53226-3413 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haeger, Robert J. 5317 South 98th Street Hales Corners, WI 53130 / US | [1992/51] | Representative(s) | von Füner, Alexander, et al v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/51] | von Füner, Alexander, Dr., et al Patentanwälte v. Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92107463.9 | 30.04.1992 | [1992/51] | Priority number, date | US19910699257 | 13.05.1991 Original published format: US 699257 | [1992/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0518045 | Date: | 16.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C09J123/16, C09J123/20, C09J11/06, C09J11/08 | [1992/51] | CPC: |
C09J123/20 (EP);
C09J123/16 (EP);
C08L2666/02 (EP);
C08L2666/04 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C09J123/16, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C09J123/16, C08L2666/04 (EP);
C09J123/20, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C09J123/20, C08L2666/04 (EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/51] | Title | German: | Druckempfindliche Heissschmelzkleber | [1992/51] | English: | Hot melt pressure sensitive adhesives | [1992/51] | French: | Colles thermofusibles auto-adhésives | [1992/51] | File destroyed: | 28.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 17.06.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/11] | 08.10.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0331410 ; | [X]US4857594 ; | [A]EP0314495 ; | [A]US4826909 ; | [A]US4956207 |