EP0514715 - Method for producing a particulate zeolite [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/48] | Method for producing a particulate zeolite and a particulate zeolite produced thereby | ||
[1997/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.12.1998 [1998/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8205 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530 / JP | ||
Former [1992/48] | For all designated states ASAHI KASEI KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishida, Hiroshi 1272-15, Nishiachi-cho Kurashiki-shi, Okayama-ken / JP | 02 /
Nakagawa, Koji 1072-25, Nishitomii Kurashiki-shi, Okayama-ken / JP | [1992/48] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/48] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92107735.0 | 07.05.1992 | [1992/48] | Priority number, date | JP19910140775 | 17.05.1991 Original published format: JP 14077591 | [1992/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0514715 | Date: | 25.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0514715 | Date: | 29.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C01B39/38 | [1997/52] | CPC: |
C01B39/38 (EP,US);
Y10S423/22 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/48] | C01B33/34 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1992/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines teilchenförmigen Zeoliths | [1997/52] | English: | Method for producing a particulate zeolite | [1997/52] | French: | Procédé de préparation de zéolithe sous forme de particules | [1997/52] |
Former [1992/48] | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines teilchenförmigen Zeoliths und so erhaltener teilchenförmiger Zeolith | ||
Former [1992/48] | Method for producing a particulate zeolite and a particulate zeolite produced thereby | ||
Former [1992/48] | Procédé de préparation de zéolithe sous forme de particules et la zéolithe obtenue par ce procédé | Examination procedure | 01.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/48] | 06.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP60077123 ; | [AD]JP60071519 ; | [A]JP62015288 ; | [AD]JP63315512 ; | [AD]US4175114 (PLANK CHARLES J [US], et al); | [A]GB2164326 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND) | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 211 (C-300)(1934) 29 August 1985 & JP-A-60 077 123 ( CHIYODA KAKO KENSETSU K.K. ) 1 May 1985, & JP60077123 A 19850501 | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 205 (C-299)(1928) 22 August 1985 & JP-A-60 071 519 ( CHIYODA KAKO KENSETSU K.K. ) 23 April 1985, & JP60071519 A 19850423 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 192 (C-429)(2639) 19 June 1987 & JP-A-62 015 288 ( CHIYODA CHEM ENG & CONSTR CO LTD ) 23 January 1987, & JP62015288 A 19870123 | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 158 (C-586)(3506) 17 April 1989 & JP-A-63 315 512 ( ASAHI CHEM IND CO LTD ) 23 December 1988, & JP63315512 A 19881223 | Examination | EP0011362 |