EP0514752 - Shower [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRIEDRICH GROHE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Hauptstrasse 137 D-58675 Hemer / DE | [1992/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bischoff, Bernd Prinzhornstrasse 9 W-5870 Hemer / DE | [1992/48] | Application number, filing date | 92108041.2 | 13.05.1992 | [1992/48] | Priority number, date | DE19914116927 | 24.05.1991 Original published format: DE 4116927 | [1992/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0514752 | Date: | 25.11.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0514752 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B05B1/18, B05B1/16 | [1992/48] | CPC: |
B05B1/1681 (EP,US);
B05B1/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/48] | Title | German: | Brause | [1992/48] | English: | Shower | [1992/48] | French: | Douche | [1992/48] | Examination procedure | 25.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/13] | 13.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 28.12.1994 | [2000/05] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2155075 (B F A PRODUCTS PTY LTD); | [A]DE3300469 (TENGE RIETBERG CARL FRIEDRICH); | [A]WO8404059 (MEDEPE PTY LTD [AU]) |