EP0520177 - Resorbable tendon and bone augmentation device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.1996 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Synthes AG, Chur Grabenstrasse 15 7002 Chur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | For all designated states Synthes AG, Chur Grabenstrasse 15 CH-7002 Chur / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gogolewski, Sylwester Compogna CH-7492 Alvaneu-Dorf / CH | 02 /
Beck, Martin Furrengasse 17 CH-6004 Lucerne / CH | 03 /
Gerber, Christian Sidlerstrasse 6 CH-3012 Berne / CH | 04 /
Scheeberger, Alberto G. Grüenistrasse 2 CH-7270 Davos / CH | 05 /
Perren, Stephan Dischmastrasse 22 CH-7260 Davos / CH | [1995/50] |
Former [1993/01] | 01 /
Gogolewski, Sylwester Compogna CH-7492 Alvaneu-Dorf / CH | ||
02 /
Beck, Martin Furrengasse 17 CH-6004 Lucerne / CH | |||
03 /
Gerber, Christian Sidlerstrasse 6 CH-3012 Berne / CH | |||
04 /
Scheeberger, Alberto G. Grüenistrasse 2 CH-7270 Davos / CH | |||
05 /
Perren, Stephan Dischmastrasse 22 CH-7270 Davos / CH | Representative(s) | Lusuardi, Werther Dr. Lusuardi AG Kreuzbühlstrasse 8 8008 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | Lusuardi, Werther Giovanni, Dr. Dr. Lusuardi AG, Kreuzbühlstrasse 8 CH-8008 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 92108135.2 | 14.05.1992 | [1993/01] | Priority number, date | US19910705389 | 24.05.1991 Original published format: US 705389 | [1993/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0520177 | Date: | 30.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0520177 | Date: | 13.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/08, A61B17/04, A61L27/00 | [1993/01] | CPC: |
A61L31/148 (EP,US);
A61B17/0401 (EP,US);
A61B17/0642 (EP,US);
A61B17/1146 (EP,US);
A61B17/58 (EP,US);
A61L31/06 (EP,US);
A61L31/125 (EP,US);
A61B17/1778 (EP,US);
A61B17/1796 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00004 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0406 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0414 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0459 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0464 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0641 (EP,US);
A61F2/0811 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61L31/06, A61L31/125, A61L31/148, C08L67/04 (EP,US);
A61L31/06, C08L67/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1993/01] | Title | German: | Resorbierbare Sehnen- und Knochenverstärkungseinrichtung | [1993/01] | English: | Resorbable tendon and bone augmentation device | [1993/01] | French: | Dispositif résorbable pour renforcer les tendons et les os | [1993/01] | Examination procedure | 14.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/53] | 26.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.12.1995 | NL | 13.12.1995 | [2003/07] |
Former [1996/42] | AT | 13.12.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2422386 (BUSCAYRET CHRISTIAN [FR]); | [Y]DE2947985 (VNII ISPYTATEL MED TECH [SU]); | [A]WO8803417 (MATERIAL CONSULTANTS OY [FI]); | [A]WO8806872 (ASTRA MEDITEC AB [SE]); | [Y]DE9002844U |