EP0548452 - Hydrophilic silicone-modified polyester resin and fibers and films made therefrom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.1998 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.03.1998 [1998/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OSi SPECIALTIES, INC. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Route 100C, Silicones Building Tarrytown, NY 10591-6728 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/14] | For all designated states OSi Specialties, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Silicones Building Tarrytown, NY 10591-6728 / US | ||
Former [1995/06] | For all designated states OSi Specialties, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Silicones Building Tarrytown, NY 10591-6728 / US | ||
Former [1993/26] | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS & PLASTICS TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury, Connecticut 06817-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Young, Douglas Jay 32 Pine Brook Loop Hopewell Junction 12533, New York / US | 02 /
Murphy, Gerald Joseph 8 Mockingbird court Hopewell Junction 12533, New York / US | [1993/26] | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/26] | von Hellfeld, Axel, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92108499.2 | 20.05.1992 | [1993/26] | Priority number, date | US19910813024 | 24.12.1991 Original published format: US 813024 | [1993/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0548452 | Date: | 30.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0548452 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/695, C08G77/445 | [1993/26] | CPC: |
C08G77/445 (EP,US);
C08G63/6956 (EP,US);
C08G77/46 (EP,US);
D01F6/84 (EP,US);
D01F6/86 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/26] | Title | German: | Hydrophiles silikonmodifiziertes Polyesterharz und daraus hergestellte Fasern und Folien | [1993/26] | English: | Hydrophilic silicone-modified polyester resin and fibers and films made therefrom | [1993/26] | French: | Résine polyester hydrophile modifiée par du silicone et fibres et films obtenus à partir de celle-ci | [1993/26] | Examination procedure | 06.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/40] | 27.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP61247737 ; | [A]JP2001731 ; | [AD]US4640962 (OSTROZYNSKI ROBERT L [US], et al); | [A]US4937277 (O'LENICK JR ANTHONY J [US]); | [A]EP0118388 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) | [A] - DATABASE WPIL Section Ch, Week 8651, 18 February 1987 Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A25, AN 86-334267 & JP-A-61 247 737 (SANYO CHEM. IND. LTD.) 5 November 1986, & JP61247737 A 19861105 | [A] - DATABASE WPIL Section Ch, Week 9007, 11 April 1990 Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A23, AN 90-048363 & JP-A-2 001 731 (MITSUBISHI KASEI CORP.) 8 January 1990, & JP2001731 A 19900108 |