EP0570611 - Bridging device for expansion joints [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maurer Söhne GmbH & Co. KG Frankfurter Ring 193 80807 München / DE | [1997/03] |
Former [1993/47] | For all designated states Friedrich Maurer Söhne GmbH & Co. KG Postfach 44 01 45 D-80750 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Erlmeier, Robert, Dr. Schleissheimer Strasse 186 W-8000 München 40 / DE | [1993/47] | Representative(s) | Grosse, Wolfgang, et al Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/47] | Grosse, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl, Kirschner Grosse, Bockhorni & Partner Forstenrieder Allee 59 D-81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92108545.2 | 20.05.1992 | [1993/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0570611 | Date: | 24.11.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0570611 | Date: | 28.02.1996 | [1996/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C04B26/14, E01D19/06 | [1993/47] | CPC: |
C04B26/14 (EP);
E01D19/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, NL [1993/47] | Title | German: | Überbrückungskonstruktion für Dehnungsfugen | [1993/47] | English: | Bridging device for expansion joints | [1993/47] | French: | Dispositif de recouvrement pour joints de dilatation | [1993/47] | Examination procedure | 23.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/21] | 24.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 28.02.1996 | FR | 28.02.1996 | GB | 28.02.1996 | NL | 28.02.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | ES | 28.02.1996 | |
GB | 28.02.1996 | ||
NL | 28.02.1996 | ||
FR | 26.07.1996 | ||
Former [2002/25] | ES | 28.02.1996 | |
GB | 28.02.1996 | ||
FR | 26.07.1996 | ||
Former [1997/14] | GB | 28.02.1996 | |
FR | 26.07.1996 | ||
Former [1997/06] | FR | 26.07.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3031271 (BRITFLEX RESIN SYST LTD [JP]); | [A]US4736010 (SUZUKI HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [A]EP0309221 (EAGLE PICHER IND INC [US]); | [A]EP0434214 (TEXACO CHEMICAL [US]); | [E]EP0512460 (CHEMWELL CHEMIE GMBH [DE]); | [A] - DRAKE R.S., EGAN D.R., MURPHY W.T., "ELASTOMER-MODIFIED EPOXY RESINS IN COATINGS APPLICATIONS.", Water-Soluble Polymers: Synthesis, Solution Properties and Applications, American Chemical Society, Washington, DC, US, Washington, DC, US, (19830101), vol. 221., ISBN 978-0-5412-3408-9, pages 01 - 20., XP000123110 |