Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0515975
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
05.09.1997 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.10.1997 [1997/43] |
13.09.1996 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 30.10.1996 [1996/44] |
23.07.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.06.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
26.04.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.03.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
02.03.1995 |
First examination report |
|
08.11.1993 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.12.1993 [1993/52] |
19.03.1993 |
Publication of search report |
published on 12.05.1993 [1993/19] |
16.10.1992 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.12.1992 [1992/49] |