Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3042919B | Global Dossier | 22.05.2000 | B2 | JPH04355100 | 09.12.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2043504 | 29.05.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0515975 | Global Dossier | 30.10.1996 | B1 | EP0515975 | 12.05.1993 | A3 | EP0515975 | 02.12.1992 | A2 | Priority number | Date | CA2043504 | 29.05.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2043504 | 17.01.1995 | C | Priority number | Date | CA2043504 | 29.05.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69214878T | 03.04.1997 | T2 | DE69214878D1 | 05.12.1996 | D1 | Priority number | Date | CA2043504 | 29.05.1991 |