EP0514890 - Method for purifying polysaccharides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.09.1997 [1997/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | For all designated states SHIN-ETSU BIO, Inc. 6650 Lusk Boulevard, Suite B-102 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/43] | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | ||
For all designated states SHIN-ETSU BIO, Inc. 6650 Lusk Boulevard, Suite B-102 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | |||
Former [1992/48] | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maruyama, Kazumasa, Synthetic Technology Lab. Shin-Etsu Chem. Co,Ltd, 28-1, Oaza Nishi-fukushima Kubiki-mura, Nakakubiki-gun, Nigata 942 / JP | 02 /
Yamamoto, Kazuyuki, Synthetic Technology Lab. Shin-Etsu Chem. Co,Ltd, 28-1, Oaza Nishi-fukushima Kubiki-mura, Nakakubiki-gun, Nigata 942 / JP | 03 /
Nagura, Shigehiro, Synthetic Technology Lab. Shin-Etsu Chem. Co,Ltd, 28-1, Oaza Nishi-fukushima Kubiki-mura, Nakakubiki-gun, Nigata 942 / JP | 04 /
Homma, Taira, Synthetic Technology Lab. Shin-Etsu Chem. Co,Ltd, 28-1, Oaza Nishi-fukushima Kubiki-mura, Nakakubiki-gun, Nigata 942 / JP | [1992/48] | Representative(s) | Bühling, Gerhard, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/48] | Bühling, Gerhard, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92108591.6 | 21.05.1992 | [1992/48] | Priority number, date | JP19910117582 | 22.05.1991 Original published format: JP 11758291 | [1992/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0514890 | Date: | 25.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0514890 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0514890 | Date: | 25.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08B37/00 | [1992/48] | CPC: |
C08B37/0003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1992/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Polysacchariden | [1992/48] | English: | Method for purifying polysaccharides | [1992/48] | French: | Procédé pour purifier des polysaccharides | [1992/48] | Examination procedure | 20.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/46] | 14.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP58103502 ; | [Y]JP48029309B ; | [A]GB2218429 (CHISSO CORP [JP]); | [A]GB2232993 (JUNGBUNZLAUER AG [AT]); | [AD]EP0375099 (DAI ICHI KOGYO SEIYAKU CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US4690788 (YADA AKIRA [JP], et al) | [Y] - DATABASE WPIL Week 8330, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 720349 & JP-A-58 103 502 (MITSUBISHI ACETATE) 20 June 1983, & JP58103502 A 19830620 | [Y] - DATABASE WPI Week 7337, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 54371U & JP-B-48 029 309 (TEIJIN LTD) 8 September 1973, & JP48029309B B 19730908 |