EP0517074 - Information recording/reproduction apparatus and method for recording and/or reproducing information onto and/or from recording medium using probe electrodes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/50] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hatanaka, Katsunori, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Sakai, Kunihiro, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Oguchi, Takahiro, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Yamano, Akihiko, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Shido, Shunichi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1992/50] | Representative(s) | Weser, Wolfgang Weser & Kollegen Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/18] | Weser, Wolfgang Dres. Weser & Martin, Patentanwälte, Radeckestrasse 43 D-81245 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/50] | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 D-81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92108879.5 | 26.05.1992 | [1992/50] | Priority number, date | JP19910134211 | 05.06.1991 Original published format: JP 13421191 | [1992/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0517074 | Date: | 09.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0517074 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0517074 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G11B9/00, G11B20/18, H03M13/00 | [1995/07] | CPC: |
B82Y15/00 (EP,US);
G11B9/14 (EP,US);
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
G11B20/1833 (EP,US);
H03M13/151 (EP,US);
Y10S977/874 (EP,US);
Y10S977/947 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1992/50] | G11B9/00, G11B20/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1992/50] | Title | German: | Informationsaufzeichnungs-/Wiedergabegerät und Methode zur Informationsaufzeichnung oder /-wiedergabe auf oder von einem Aufzeichnungsmedium mittels Sondenelektroden | [1992/50] | English: | Information recording/reproduction apparatus and method for recording and/or reproducing information onto and/or from recording medium using probe electrodes | [1992/50] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement/de reproduction d'information et méthode pour l'enregistrement ou la reproduction sur/ou d'un milieu d'enregistrement utilisant des électrodes de sondes | [1992/50] | Examination procedure | 09.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/41] | 21.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.11.1999 | BE | 17.11.1999 | CH | 17.11.1999 | ES | 17.11.1999 | GR | 17.11.1999 | LI | 17.11.1999 | NL | 17.11.1999 | SE | 17.11.1999 | DK | 17.02.2000 | PT | 17.02.2000 | LU | 26.05.2000 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/07] | AT | 17.11.1999 | |
BE | 17.11.1999 | ||
CH | 17.11.1999 | ||
ES | 17.11.1999 | ||
GR | 17.11.1999 | ||
LI | 17.11.1999 | ||
NL | 17.11.1999 | ||
SE | 17.11.1999 | ||
DK | 17.02.2000 | ||
PT | 17.02.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 17.11.1999 | |
BE | 17.11.1999 | ||
CH | 17.11.1999 | ||
ES | 17.11.1999 | ||
LI | 17.11.1999 | ||
NL | 17.11.1999 | ||
SE | 17.11.1999 | ||
DK | 17.02.2000 | ||
PT | 17.02.2000 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 17.11.1999 | |
BE | 17.11.1999 | ||
CH | 17.11.1999 | ||
ES | 17.11.1999 | ||
LI | 17.11.1999 | ||
NL | 17.11.1999 | ||
SE | 17.11.1999 | ||
PT | 17.02.2000 | ||
MC | 31.05.2000 | ||
Former [2003/07] | AT | 17.11.1999 | |
BE | 17.11.1999 | ||
CH | 17.11.1999 | ||
ES | 17.11.1999 | ||
LI | 17.11.1999 | ||
NL | 17.11.1999 | ||
SE | 17.11.1999 | ||
PT | 17.02.2000 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 17.11.1999 | |
BE | 17.11.1999 | ||
CH | 17.11.1999 | ||
ES | 17.11.1999 | ||
LI | 17.11.1999 | ||
SE | 17.11.1999 | ||
PT | 17.02.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 17.11.1999 | |
BE | 17.11.1999 | ||
CH | 17.11.1999 | ||
LI | 17.11.1999 | ||
SE | 17.11.1999 | ||
PT | 17.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 17.11.1999 | |
BE | 17.11.1999 | ||
CH | 17.11.1999 | ||
LI | 17.11.1999 | ||
PT | 17.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/51] | AT | 17.11.1999 | |
BE | 17.11.1999 | ||
PT | 17.02.2000 | ||
CH | 22.02.2000 | ||
LI | 22.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/50] | BE | 17.11.1999 | |
PT | 17.02.2000 | ||
CH | 22.02.2000 | ||
LI | 22.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/43] | BE | 17.11.1999 | |
PT | 17.02.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS58127445 ; | [A]JPS5724143 ; | [A]JPS62239387 ; | [Y]EP0382192 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * column 4, line 18 - column 5, line 40 * * column 8, line 34 - column 9, line 12; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US4956817 (WEST PAUL E [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 5, line 6 - line 47 * * column 10, line 16 - line 49; figure 15 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831025), vol. 7, no. 239, Database accession no. (E - 206), & JP58127445 A 19830729 (NIPPON VICTOR K. K.) [A] 1,3,6,8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820528), vol. 6, no. 91, Database accession no. (E - 109), & JP57024143 A 19820208 (SONY CORP) [A] * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880407), vol. 12, no. 107, Database accession no. (P - 686), & JP62239387 A 19871020 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] * abstract * |