EP0516065 - Light-sensitive silver halide color photographic material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.1994 [1994/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/49] | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishi-shinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakatsugawa, Hiroshi, Konica Corporation 1 Sakura-machi, Hino-Shi Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kojima, Takaaki, Konica Corporation 1 Sakura-machi, Hino-Shi Tokyo / JP | [1992/49] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/49] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 92108900.9 | 27.05.1992 | [1992/49] | Priority number, date | JP19910123791 | 28.05.1991 Original published format: JP 12379191 | [1992/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0516065 | Date: | 02.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G03C7/30 | [1992/49] | CPC: |
G03C7/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1992/49] | Title | German: | Farbphotographisches, lichtempfindliches Silberhalogenidmaterial | [1992/49] | English: | Light-sensitive silver halide color photographic material | [1992/49] | French: | Matériau photographique couleur à l'halogénure d'argent sensible à la lumière | [1992/49] | File destroyed: | 28.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 03.06.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/10] | 07.10.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH01195446 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND); | [Y]DE3919550 (AGFA GEVAERT AG [DE]); | [YD]GB2194068 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) |