EP0516071 - Sawing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.06.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MVZ MASCHINENBAU UND VERZAHNUNGSTECHNIK, JOHANNES FALKENSTEIN Zeppelinstrasse 16 D-88427 Bad Schussenried / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/49] | For all designated states MVZ MASCHINENBAU UND VERZAHNUNGSTECHNIK, JOHANNES FALKENSTEIN Zeppelinstrasse 16 D-88427 Bad Schussenried / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Falkenstein, Johannes Zeppelinstrasse 16 W-7953 Bad Schussenried / DE | [1992/49] | Representative(s) | Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Grosstobeler Strasse 39 88276 Berg / Ravensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Eisele, Otten, Roth & Dobler Patentanwälte Karlstrasse 8 88212 Ravensburg / DE | ||
Former [1992/49] | Patentanwälte Eisele, Otten & Roth Seestrasse 42 D-88214 Ravensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 92108923.1 | 27.05.1992 | [1992/49] | Priority number, date | DE19914117687 | 29.05.1991 Original published format: DE 4117687 | [1992/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0516071 | Date: | 02.12.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0516071 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B28D1/08, B28D7/00, B23D53/00, B23D57/00 | [1992/49] | CPC: |
B28D1/30 (EP);
B23D59/008 (EP);
B28D1/003 (EP);
B28D1/086 (EP);
B28D1/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1992/49] | Title | German: | Sägemaschine | [1992/49] | English: | Sawing machine | [1992/49] | French: | Machine à scier | [1992/49] | File destroyed: | 21.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 01.10.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/31] | 11.01.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]WO8803860 ; | [Y]DE9001537U ; | [AD]DE47295 ; | [AD]US2774131 ; | [AD]WO8807427 |