EP0518130 - Vehicle seat with seat height and backrest adjustment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.1997 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C. Rob. Hammerstein GmbH Postfach 13 01 18 Merscheiderstrasse 167 D-42699 Solingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/51] | For all designated states C. Rob. Hammerstein GmbH Postfach 13 01 18 Merscheiderstrasse 167 D-42699 Solingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bauer, Heinz Hammerstrasse 9 W-5650 Solingen 11 / DE | 02 /
Becker, Burckhard Obenkatternberg 25 W-5650 Solingen 11 / DE | 03 /
Frohnhaus, Ernst-Reiner Hammerstrasse 13 W-5650 Solingen 11 / DE | 04 /
Leng, Michael Meteorstrasse 54 W-5650 Solingen 11 / DE | [1992/51] | Representative(s) | Bauer, Wulf Patentanwälte Bauer Vorberg Kayser Partnerschaft mbB Goltsteinstrasse 87 50968 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/51] | Bauer, Wulf, Dr. Bayenthalgürtel 15 D-50968 Köln (Marienburg) / DE | Application number, filing date | 92108927.2 | 27.05.1992 | [1992/51] | Priority number, date | DE19914117785 | 31.05.1991 Original published format: DE 4117785 | DE19914120121 | 19.06.1991 Original published format: DE 4120121 | [1992/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0518130 | Date: | 16.12.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0518130 | Date: | 21.02.1996 | [1996/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/22 | [1992/51] | CPC: |
B60N2/2213 (EP);
B60N2/0284 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1992/51] | Title | German: | Fahrzeugsitz mit Sitztiefen- und Rückenlehnenverstellung | [1992/51] | English: | Vehicle seat with seat height and backrest adjustment | [1992/51] | French: | Siège de véhicule à ajustement en hauteur du siège et du dossier | [1992/51] | Examination procedure | 17.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/15] | 14.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.08.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 29.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/08] | Request for further processing for: | 14.08.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 14.08.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.08.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 21.02.1996 | ES | 21.02.1996 | GB | 21.02.1996 | IT | 21.02.1996 | NL | 21.02.1996 | SE | 21.05.1996 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/25] | BE | 21.02.1996 | |
ES | 21.02.1996 | ||
GB | 21.02.1996 | ||
IT | 21.02.1996 | ||
SE | 21.05.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 21.02.1996 | |
GB | 21.02.1996 | ||
IT | 21.02.1996 | ||
SE | 21.05.1996 | ||
Former [1997/14] | BE | 21.02.1996 | |
GB | 21.02.1996 | ||
SE | 21.05.1996 | ||
Former [1996/52] | BE | 21.02.1996 | |
SE | 21.05.1996 | ||
Former [1996/42] | SE | 21.05.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2207861 (KIA MOTORS CORP); | [YD]DE3608828 (HAMMERSTEIN GMBH C ROB [DE], et al); | [YD]EP0265747 ; | [Y]DE8900349U ; | [Y]DE2024417 ; | [A]EP0022691 (RENAULT [FR]); | [A]EP0248773 (FIAT AUTO SPA [IT]); | [A]US2082297 (MILLER EDWIN W); | [A]EP0205409 (FIAT AUTO SPA [IT]); | [A]EP0211248 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) |