EP0516079 - Digital signal transmission system having monitor equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.1999 [1999/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/49] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maruyama, Akira, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa, 211 / JP | 02 /
Kimura, Shuji, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa, 211 / JP | 03 /
Yamada, Shigeki, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa, 211 / JP | 04 /
Shirai, Hiroaki, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa, 211 / JP | 05 /
Nara, Hiroichi, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa, 211 / JP | 06 /
Hanaeda, Kazunori, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa, 211 / JP | [1992/49] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/49] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92108939.7 | 27.05.1992 | [1992/49] | Priority number, date | JP19910120543 | 27.05.1991 Original published format: JP 12054391 | [1992/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0516079 | Date: | 02.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0516079 | Date: | 30.10.1996 | [1996/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04, H04Q1/24 | [1996/43] | CPC: |
H04Q11/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/49] | H04Q11/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/49] | Title | German: | Digitales Signalübertragungssystem mit Überwachungsvorrichtung | [1992/49] | English: | Digital signal transmission system having monitor equipment | [1992/49] | French: | Système de transmission de signaux numériques avec dispositif de surveillance | [1992/49] | Examination procedure | 11.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/06] | 12.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/02] | 18.08.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1998 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0398041 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-11 * column 3, line 3 - column 4, line 19 *; | [A]US4413335 (CLEMENTS JOHN L [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 4, line 40 - column 5, line 39 *; | [A]FR2256616 (PLESSEY HANDEL INVESTMENT AG [CH]) [A] 1-11 * page 6, line 26 - page 10, line 9 * * page 16, line 20 - page 17, line 9 * | [A] - B. CHENEY ET AL, "Design and Test of a 2Gb/s GaAs 16/8 Bit MUX/DEMUX Pair", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE 1988 CUSTOM INTEGRATED CIRCUITS CONFERENCE - PAPER 17.2, NEW YORK (US), (19880516), pages 1 - 4, XP000093994 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * |