EP0516151 - Coinjected plastic garment hanger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/49] | Coinjected plastic garment hangers, method of molding hangers and apparatus for implementing method | ||
[1998/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SPOTLESS PLASTICS PTY. LTD. 20-26 Sullivan Street Moorabbin, VIC 3189 / AU | [1996/24] |
Former [1992/49] | For all designated states PLASTI-FORM ENTERPRISES, INC. 105 Jefryn Boulevard East Deer Park, New York / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harmer, Ronald G. 30 Charthamwoods Drive Centereach, New York 11720 / US | 02 /
Olk, Olaf F. 289 Hoffman Avenue Hauppauge, New York 11788 / US | 03 /
Gouldson, Stanley 10 Harbour Point Drive Northport, New York 11768 / US | [1992/49] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92109101.3 | 29.05.1992 | [1992/49] | Priority number, date | US19910706779 | 29.05.1991 Original published format: US 706779 | US19920885291 | 18.05.1992 Original published format: US 885291 | [1992/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0516151 | Date: | 02.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0516151 | Date: | 07.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0516151 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/16, A47G25/14, A47G25/26 | [1992/49] | CPC: |
B29C45/1657 (EP);
A47G25/1407 (EP);
A47G25/1414 (EP);
A47G25/1421 (EP);
A47G25/28 (EP);
A47G25/30 (EP);
B29C33/424 (EP);
B29C45/1635 (EP);
B29C45/372 (EP);
B29C2037/80 (EP);
B29C2045/1659 (EP);
B29C2791/001 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1992/49] | Title | German: | Mehrkomponenten-spritzgegossener Kleiderbügel aus Kunststoff | [1998/04] | English: | Coinjected plastic garment hanger | [1998/04] | French: | Cintre co-injecté et matière plastique | [1998/04] |
Former [1992/49] | Kospritzgegossener Kleiderbügel aus Kunststoff, Verfahren zum Formen von Kleiderbügeln und Vorrichtung zum Durchführen des Verfahrens | ||
Former [1992/49] | Coinjected plastic garment hangers, method of molding hangers and apparatus for implementing method | ||
Former [1992/49] | Cintre co-injecté et matière plastique, procédé pour mouler les cintres et dispositif pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé | Miscellaneous | EPB 1998/04: (deleted) | EPB 1998/04: (deleted) | EPB 1998/04: (deleted) | EPB 1997/42: Teilanmeldung 97112079.5 eingereicht am 15/07/97 | EPB 1997/42: Divisional application 97112079.5 filed on 15/07/97 | EPB 1997/42: Demande divisionnaire 97112079.5 déposée le 15/07/97 | Examination procedure | 24.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/42] | 01.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP97112079.5 / EP0812669 | Opposition(s) | 22.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 21.01.1998 | ES | 21.01.1998 | IT | 21.01.1998 | NL | 21.01.1998 | SE | 21.04.1998 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/25] | BE | 21.01.1998 | |
ES | 21.01.1998 | ||
IT | 21.01.1998 | ||
SE | 21.04.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 21.01.1998 | |
IT | 21.01.1998 | ||
SE | 21.04.1998 | ||
Former [1998/49] | BE | 21.01.1998 | |
SE | 21.04.1998 | ||
Former [1998/43] | SE | 21.04.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP57187228 ; | [X]EP0412670 ; | [X]FR2473949 ; | [Y]FR2601618 ; | [A]EP0172149 ; | [AD]US4886195 ; | [A]DE1929875 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 31 (M-192)(1176) 8 February 1983 & JP-A-57 187 228 ( MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO ), & JP57187228 A 19830208 |