EP0517141 - High efficiency coding signal processing apparatus with error propagation influence reduction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | For all designated states TOSHIBA AVE CO., LTD 3-3-9, Shinbashi Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/44] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210 / JP | ||
For all designated states TOSHIBA AVE CO., LTD 3-3-9, Shinbashi Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | |||
Former [1995/01] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states TOSHIBA AVE CO., LTD 3-3-9, Shinbashi Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | |||
Former [1992/50] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi / JP | ||
For all designated states TOSHIBA AVE CO., LTD 3-3-9, Shinbashi Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimoda, Kenji, c/o Intellectual Property Div. K. K. Toshiba, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | 02 /
Takeda, Hitoshi, c/o Intellectual Property Div. K. K. Toshiba, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | [1992/50] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/50] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92109211.0 | 01.06.1992 | [1992/50] | Priority number, date | JP19910132999 | 04.06.1991 Original published format: JP 13299991 | [1992/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0517141 | Date: | 09.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0517141 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0517141 | Date: | 28.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/30 | [1998/44] | CPC: |
H04N5/9264 (EP,US);
H04N19/89 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/115 (EP,US);
H04N19/124 (EP,US);
H04N19/14 (EP,US);
H04N19/149 (EP,US);
H04N19/15 (EP,US);
H04N19/159 (EP,US);
H04N19/172 (EP,US);
H04N19/176 (EP,US);
H04N19/18 (EP,US);
H04N19/186 (EP,US);
H04N19/37 (EP,US);
H04N19/46 (EP,US);
H04N19/60 (EP,US);
H04N21/236 (EP,US);
H04N21/434 (EP,US);
H04N7/24 (KR);
H04N9/8042 (EP,US);
H04N9/8047 (EP,US);
H04N9/8066 (EP,US);
H04N9/888 (EP,US);
H04N19/13 (EP,US);
H04N19/146 (EP,US);
H04N19/30 (EP,US);
H04N19/65 (EP,US);
H04N19/91 (EP,US);
H04N5/783 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1992/50] | H04N7/133 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/50] | Title | German: | Signalverarbeitungseinrichtung mit hohem Wirkungsgrad und Verminderung des Einflusses von Fehlerausbreitungen | [1992/50] | English: | High efficiency coding signal processing apparatus with error propagation influence reduction | [1992/50] | French: | Dispositif de traitement de signal à haute efficacité de codage avec réduction de l'influence de propagation d'erreurs | [1992/50] | Examination procedure | 26.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/50] | 02.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP3022735 ; | [APD]JP3191676 ; | [X]US4807033 (KEESEN WERNER [DE], et al); | [A]EP0345871 (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [A]US5001561 (HASKELL BARIN G [US], et al); | [AP]EP0436251 (PHILIPS ELECTRONIQUE LAB [FR], et al); | [E]EP0493128 (CANON KK [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 147 (E-1055)12 April 1991 & JP-A-3 022 735 ( MATSHUSHITA ELECTRIC IND. CO. LTD.) & US-A-5 140 417 (TANAKA ET AL.) 18 August 1992, & JP3022735 A 19920818 | [A] - SIGNAL PROCESSING OF HDTV II September 1989, pages 769 - 776 DEL PERO ET AL. 'Criteria for the protection of the video information in a codec based on DCT' | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF ICASSP 1988 April 1988, NEW-YORK pages 1312 - 1315 AARTSEN ET AL. 'Error resilience of a video codec for low bitrates' | [AD] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS vol. 35, no. 3, August 1989, pages 450 - 457 YAMAMITSU ET AL. 'An experimental study for a home-use digital VTR' | [APD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 453 (E-1134)18 November 1991 & JP-A-3 191 676 ( TOSHIBA CORP ), & JP3191676 A 19911118 |