EP0521307 - Folding hood for motorvehicle provided with a collapsible roof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 18.01.2002 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wilhelm Karmann GmbH Karmannstrasse 1 49084 Osnabrück / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | For all designated states Wilhelm Karmann GmbH Karmannstrasse 1 D-49084 Osnabrück / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Licher, Siegfried Topsloh 9 W-4504 Georgsmarienhütte / DE | 02 /
Richter, Wolfgang Hollager Strasse 152 W-4512 Wallenhorst / DE | [1993/01] | Representative(s) | Busse & Busse Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 12 26 49002 Osnabrück / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | Busse & Busse Patentanwälte Postfach 12 26 D-49002 Osnabrück / DE | Application number, filing date | 92109422.3 | 04.06.1992 | [1993/01] | Priority number, date | DE19910008242U | 04.07.1991 Original published format: DE 9108242 U | DE19920006807U | 20.05.1992 Original published format: DE 9206807 U | [1993/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0521307 | Date: | 07.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0521307 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/52] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0521307 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/12, B60J7/20 | [1993/01] | CPC: |
B60J7/1265 (EP,US);
B60J7/1291 (EP,US);
B60J7/1642 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1993/01] | Title | German: | Faltverdeck für einen Personenkraftwagen mit aufklappbarem Dach | [1993/01] | English: | Folding hood for motorvehicle provided with a collapsible roof | [1993/01] | French: | Capote pliante pour voiture automobile avec toit repliable | [1993/01] | Examination procedure | 05.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/14] | 15.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.02.1996
ADMISSIBLE Dr. Ing. h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 1140 71283 Weissach / DE | [1996/15] | 05.11.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.03.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.11.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M01) | 11.12.1997 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 09.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 04.04.2001 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 04.04.2001 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.10.2001 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 19.12.2001 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 16.05.1998 | Appeal received No. T0519/98 | 21.07.1998 | Statement of grounds filed | 04.04.2001 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 04.04.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.04.2001 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3416286 (HOETKER DIETER); | [Y]DE3328294 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]); | [A]US2798763 (MILAN DUJIC); | [A]US4573732 (MUSCAT PETER P [US]) |