EP0518255 - Automatic sheet feeding apparatus with skew-feed correction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/51] | Automatic sheet feeding apparatus | ||
[1997/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.1998 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.03.1998 [1998/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/51] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yanagi, Haruyuki, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP | 02 /
Taniishi, Shinnosuke, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP | 03 /
Suzuki, Tetsuo, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP | 04 /
Asano, Junichi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP | 05 /
Hiramatsu, Soichi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP | 06 /
Nojima, Takashi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP | 07 /
Saikawa, Satoshi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP | [1992/51] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/51] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92109660.8 | 09.06.1992 | [1992/51] | Priority number, date | JP19910137837 | 10.06.1991 Original published format: JP 13783791 | JP19910137838 | 10.06.1991 Original published format: JP 13783891 | JP19910187656 | 26.07.1991 Original published format: JP 18765691 | [1992/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0518255 | Date: | 16.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0518255 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0518255 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B41J13/00, B65H1/02, B65H3/52, B41J13/32, B65H9/16 | [1997/13] | CPC: |
B41J13/32 (EP,US);
B41J13/103 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/26] | B41J13/00, B65H1/02, B65H3/52 | ||
Former IPC [1992/51] | B41J13/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/51] | Title | German: | Automatische Blattzuführvorrichtung mit Schrägstellungskorrektur | [1997/13] | English: | Automatic sheet feeding apparatus with skew-feed correction | [1997/13] | French: | Appareil automatique d'alimentation de feuilles avec inclinaison corrigée | [1997/13] |
Former [1992/51] | Automatische Blattzuführvorrichtung | ||
Former [1992/51] | Automatic sheet feeding apparatus | ||
Former [1992/51] | Appareil automatique d'alimentation de feuilles | Examination procedure | 28.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/09] | 28.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP56165640 ; | [A]JP59064429 ; | [A]JP54095471 ; | [A]JP54107070 ; | [AD]FR2445284 (RICOH KK [JP]); | [A]US4618134 (KAWAGUCHI KATSUHIKO [JP], et al); | [Y]EP0386737 (CANON KK [JP]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 6, no. 50 (M-120)(928) 3 April 1982 & JP-A-56 165 640 ( FUJI XEROX K.K. ) 19 December 1981, & JP56165640 A 19811219 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 170 (M-315)(1607) 7 August 1984 & JP-A-59 064 429 ( SANYO DENKI K.K. ) 12 April 1984, & JP59064429 A 19840412 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 3, no. 120 (M-75)9 October 1979 & JP-A-54 095 471 ( RICOH K.K. ) 27 July 1979, & JP54095471 A 19790727 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 3, no. 130 (M-78)27 October 1979 & JP-A-54 107 070 ( NIPPON DENKI K.K. ) 22 August 1979, & JP54107070 A 19790822 |