EP0518258 - Chip type solid electrolytic capacitor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.1996 [1996/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/51] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taniguchi, Hiromichi, c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba, 5-chome Minato-ku, Toyko / JP | [1992/51] | Representative(s) | Pätzold, Herbert Pasinger Strasse 6 82166 Gräfelfing / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/51] | Pätzold, Herbert, Dr.-Ing. Steubstrasse 10 D-82166 Gräfelfing / DE | Application number, filing date | 92109670.7 | 09.06.1992 | [1992/51] | Priority number, date | JP19910142847 | 14.06.1991 Original published format: JP 14284791 | [1992/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0518258 | Date: | 16.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0518258 | Date: | 06.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01G9/00 | [1992/51] | CPC: |
H01G9/012 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/51] | Title | German: | Festelektrolytkondensator in Chipbauweise | [1992/51] | English: | Chip type solid electrolytic capacitor | [1992/51] | French: | Condensateur à électrolyte solide du type puce | [1992/51] | Examination procedure | 27.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/52] | 05.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP1201912 | [X] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN vol. 28, no. 3, August 1985, pages 1310 - 1311; 'NON-REVERSIBLE SURFACE-MOUNTED CHIP CAPACITOR' | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 503 13 November 1989 & JP-A-1 201 912 ( NEC CORPORATION ) 14 August 1989, & JP1201912 A 19890814 |