EP0518287 - Exposure control and automatic signal gain control for a video camera provided with illumination means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.10.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.11.1997 [1997/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIWA CO., LTD. 2-11, Ikenohata 1-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/51] | For all designated states AIWA CO., LTD. 2-11, Ikenohata 1-chome Taito-ku, Tokyo 110 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hashimoto, Hiroyuki 374, Yatsuka-nakacho Souka-shi, Saitama 340 / JP | 02 /
Saito, Haruo 4-12, Kita 1-chome Kuki-shi, Saitama 346 / JP | 03 /
Ishii, Satoshi 3487-3, Shimooshi, Fukiagemachi Kita-adachi-gun, Saitama 369-01 / JP | [1992/51] | Representative(s) | Müller, Frithjof E. Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/51] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92109737.4 | 10.06.1992 | [1992/51] | Priority number, date | JP19910138013 | 10.06.1991 Original published format: JP 13801391 | JP19910142136 | 13.06.1991 Original published format: JP 14213691 | JP19910142140 | 13.06.1991 Original published format: JP 14214091 | JP19910142144 | 13.06.1991 Original published format: JP 14214491 | JP19910142159 | 13.06.1991 Original published format: JP 14215991 | JP19910146335 | 18.06.1991 Original published format: JP 14633591 | JP19910146336 | 18.06.1991 Original published format: JP 14633691 | JP19910146339 | 18.06.1991 Original published format: JP 14633991 | JP19910148613 | 20.06.1991 Original published format: JP 14861391 | JP19910148625 | 20.06.1991 Original published format: JP 14862591 | [1992/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0518287 | Date: | 16.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0518287 | Date: | 23.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/235, H04N5/243, H04N5/262, H04N5/76 | [1992/51] | CPC: |
H04N1/212 (EP,US);
H04N1/2112 (EP,US);
H04N23/70 (EP,US);
H04N23/76 (EP,US);
H04N5/77 (EP,US);
H04N2101/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1992/51] | Title | German: | Belichtungssteuerung und automatische Signalverstärkungssteuerung für eine Videokamera mit Beleuchtungsmitteln | [1992/51] | English: | Exposure control and automatic signal gain control for a video camera provided with illumination means | [1992/51] | French: | Contrôle d'exposition et contrôle automatique de gain de signal pour une caméra vidéo ayant des moyens d'éclairage | [1992/51] | Examination procedure | 01.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/39] | 20.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/48] | 27.06.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1997 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2018077485 ; | [A]JPS55165077 ; | [A]JPS6054573 ; | [A]US3821468 (BUSCH A); | [A]US4356511 (TSUJIMURA KATSUHITO); | [XY]EP0222641 (I2S [FR]); | [A]EP0280511 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]); | [A]US4791480 (MURANAKA YUUICHI [JP]); | [A]US4833538 (HIEDA TERUO [JP]); | [XY]US4860108 (SAITO MITSURU [JP], et al); | [XA]GB2221119 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]EP0356123 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0423961 (SONY CORP [JP]) |