EP0518305 - Self-supporting wall with sound absorbing properties [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.05.1994 [1994/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FIMIT IPSE S.r.L Via Rossetti, 34 I-10154 Torino / IT | [1992/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ostino, Antonio Via S. Giovanni 55 I-14022 Castelnuovo Don Bosco (Asti) / IT | [1992/51] | Representative(s) | Gerbino, Angelo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/51] | Gerbino, Angelo, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 I-10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 92109796.0 | 11.06.1992 | [1992/51] | Priority number, date | IT1991TO00139U | 12.06.1991 Original published format: IT TO910139 U | [1992/51] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0518305 | Date: | 16.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/86 | [1992/51] | CPC: |
E04B1/86 (EP);
E04B2001/8471 (EP);
E04B2001/848 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, GR, PT [1992/51] | Title | German: | Selbsttragende Schalldämpfende Wand | [1992/51] | English: | Self-supporting wall with sound absorbing properties | [1992/51] | French: | Paroi insonorisante autoportante | [1992/51] | File destroyed: | 31.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 17.06.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/18] | 29.11.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3479779 ; | [Y]US3866001 ; | [A]GB1205295 ; | [A]FR2580718 ; | [A]FR60625E |