blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0527309

EP0527309 - Method for processing chlorosilane distillation waste with hydrochloric acid, producing no waste water [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  01.06.1994
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip01.06.1994Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 20.07.1994 [1994/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HÜLS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
45764 Marl / DE
[N/P]
Former [1993/07]For all designated states
HÜLS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
D-45764 Marl / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Ruff, Klaus
Im Grund 7b
W-5210 Troisdorf / DE
02 / Falk, Bernhard, Dr.
Friedrichstrasse 40
W-7888 Rheinfelden / DE
[1993/07]
Application number, filing date92109996.613.06.1992
[1993/07]
Priority number, dateDE1991412667013.08.1991         Original published format: DE 4126670
[1993/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0527309
Date:17.02.1993
Language:DE
[1993/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.12.1992
ClassificationIPC:C01B7/01, A62D3/00
[1993/07]
CPC:
A62D3/35 (EP,US); C02F1/52 (KR); C01B33/1071 (EP,US);
C01B7/01 (EP,US); A62D2101/22 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1993/07]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur abwasserfreien Aufarbeitung von Rückständen einer Chlorsilandestillation mit Salzsäure[1993/07]
English:Method for processing chlorosilane distillation waste with hydrochloric acid, producing no waste water[1993/07]
French:Méthode de traitement des déchets de la distillation de chlorosilanes avec l'acide chlorhydrique, sans production d'eau résiduaire[1993/07]
File destroyed:15.01.2000
Examination procedure16.01.1993Examination requested  [1993/11]
11.11.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.05.1994Application withdrawn by applicant  [1994/29]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]FR2162364  (DEGUSSA);
 [AD]DE3642285  (HUELS TROISDORF);
 [AD]DE3742614  (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]);
 [A]EP0433600  (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.