EP0523381 - Method and device for charging a rechargeable battery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/03] | Device for charging a rechargeable battery | ||
[1998/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THEO BENNING ELEKTROTECHNIK UND ELEKTRONIK GMBH & CO. KG Münsterstrasse 135 - 137 D-46397 Bocholt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/03] | For all designated states THEO BENNING ELEKTROTECHNIK UND ELEKTRONIK GMBH & CO. KG Münsterstrasse 135 - 137 D-46397 Bocholt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saul, Wilhelm Up'm Höwel 27 W-4290 Bocholt / DE | [1993/03] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/03] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 D-40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 92110104.4 | 16.06.1992 | [1993/03] | Priority number, date | DE19910008866U | 18.07.1991 Original published format: DE 9108866 U | [1993/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0523381 | Date: | 20.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0523381 | Date: | 14.07.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0523381 | Date: | 07.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00, H02J7/10 | [1993/28] | CPC: |
H02J7/00047 (EP);
H02J7/0071 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1993/03] | H02J7/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Laden wiederaufladbarer Batterien | [1998/17] | English: | Method and device for charging a rechargeable battery | [1998/17] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de charge d'une batterie rechargeable | [1998/17] |
Former [1993/03] | Vorrichtung zum Laden wiederaufladbarer Batterien | ||
Former [1993/03] | Device for charging a rechargeable battery | ||
Former [1993/03] | Dispositif de charge d'une batterie rechargeable | Examination procedure | 29.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/09] | 15.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 07.10.1998 | GR | 07.10.1998 | IT | 07.10.1998 | NL | 07.10.1998 | DK | 07.01.1999 | SE | 07.01.1999 | BE | 30.06.1999 | [2008/02] |
Former [2003/45] | ES | 07.10.1998 | |
GR | 07.10.1998 | ||
NL | 07.10.1998 | ||
DK | 07.01.1999 | ||
SE | 07.01.1999 | ||
BE | 30.06.1999 | ||
Former [2003/07] | ES | 07.10.1998 | |
GR | 07.10.1998 | ||
NL | 07.10.1998 | ||
SE | 07.01.1999 | ||
BE | 30.06.1999 | ||
Former [2002/25] | ES | 07.10.1998 | |
GR | 07.10.1998 | ||
SE | 07.01.1999 | ||
BE | 30.06.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | GR | 07.10.1998 | |
SE | 07.01.1999 | ||
BE | 30.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | SE | 07.01.1999 | |
BE | 30.06.1999 | ||
Former [1999/32] | SE | 07.01.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2358767 (BENNING ELEKTROTECHNIK [DE]); | [A]DE3637669 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [X]EP0349995 (ELEKTRON BREMEN ELEKTROTECH [DE]); | [E]WO9215140 (INST NAT POLYTECH GRENOBLE [FR], et al) |