EP0521332 - Multi-layer label [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.09.1997 [1997/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Treichel, Heinz Im Mehrheimer Lehm 42 W-4047 Dormagen / DE | 02 /
Schiffer, Norbert Ahornweg 7 W-4049 Rommerskirchen / DE | 03 /
Schüller, Franz Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Urbanizacao Matos Romao, Lote 31, Aldeia de Jozo P-2750 Cascais / PT | [1993/01] | Application number, filing date | 92110116.8 | 16.06.1992 | [1993/01] | Priority number, date | DE19910008020U | 29.06.1991 Original published format: DE 9108020 U | DE19914131002 | 18.09.1991 Original published format: DE 4131002 | [1993/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0521332 | Date: | 07.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0521332 | Date: | 18.09.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G09F3/02, G09F3/10 | [1993/01] | CPC: |
G09F3/0289 (EP,US);
G09F3/0288 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/01] | Title | German: | Mehrlagiges Etikett | [1993/01] | English: | Multi-layer label | [1993/01] | French: | Etiquette multicouche | [1993/01] | Examination procedure | 26.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/12] | 19.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0093000 (DENNY DOUGLAS CORNELIUS [GB], et al); | [A]GB2192605 (INSTANCE LTD DAVID J); | [A]EP0275525 (ZWECKFORM ETIKETTIERTECHNIK [DE]); | [A]EP0382398 (DENNY BROS PRINTING [GB]) |