EP0519408 - Granular media regeneration apparatus and process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bratten, Jack R. 4970 St. James Drive West Bloomfield Michigan 48322 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/52] | For all designated states Bratten, Jack R. 4970 St. James Drive West Bloomfield, Michigan 48322 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/52] | Representative(s) | Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron, Eckert Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/45] | Schaumburg, Thoenes & Thurn Mauerkircherstrasse 31 D-81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/52] | Schaumburg, Thoenes & Thurn Mauerkircherstrasse 31 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92110164.8 | 16.06.1992 | [1992/52] | Priority number, date | US19910718988 | 21.06.1991 Original published format: US 718988 | [1992/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0519408 | Date: | 23.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0519408 | Date: | 08.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B01D24/14, B01D24/46 | [1992/52] | CPC: |
B01D24/14 (EP,US);
B01D24/4631 (EP,US);
B01D24/4673 (EP,US);
B01D24/4694 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1993/17] |
Former [1992/52] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren für das Regenerieren von körnigen Medien | [1992/52] | English: | Granular media regeneration apparatus and process | [1992/52] | French: | Appareil et procédé pour la régénération de matériaux granulaires | [1992/52] | Examination procedure | 17.07.1992 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, GR, LU, MC, NL, PT | 12.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/15] | 08.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.09.1992 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.1992 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.1992 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.1992 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.1992 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.1992 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.1992 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.1992 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.1992 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB191209668 (TAYLOR JOHN, et al); | [Y]GB1057015 (JAN KASPAR, et al); | [A]DE2043845 ; | [YD]US4496464 (HENSLEY CLIFFORD J [US]); | [A]FR2554802 (PROJEKT WASSERWIRTSCHAFT VEB [DD]) |