EP0519464 - Nucleoside derivatives and production thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.12.1996 [1996/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Inc. No. 15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/52] | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Inc. No. 15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shiragami, Hiroshi, c/o Central Research Lab. Ajinomoto Co., Inc., No. 1-1, Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Uchida, Yumiko, c/o Central Research Laboratories Ajinomoto Co., Inc., No. 1-1, Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Izawa, Kunisuke, c/o Central Research Laboratories Ajinomoto Co., Inc., No. 1-1, Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1992/52] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/52] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92110299.2 | 17.06.1992 | [1992/52] | Priority number, date | JP19910245290 | 19.06.1991 Original published format: JP 24529091 | [1992/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0519464 | Date: | 23.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0519464 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07H19/06 | [1992/52] | CPC: |
C07D403/04 (EP,US);
C07H19/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/52] | Title | German: | Nucleosidderivate und deren Herstellung | [1992/52] | English: | Nucleoside derivatives and production thereof | [1992/52] | French: | Dérivés de nucléoside et leur préparation | [1992/52] | Examination procedure | 16.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/52] | 14.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4904770 (STARRETT JR JOHN E [US], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, C field, vol. 13, no. 72, February 17, 1989 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT page 74 C 570 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, C field, vol. 9, no. 166, July 11, 1985 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT page 91 C 290 | [AD] - THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, vol. 54, 1989, American Chemical Society, M.M. MANSURI et al. "Pre- paration of 1-(2,3-Dideoxy- -Beta-D-glycero-pent-2- -enofuranosyl)thymine (d4T)1 and 2',3'-Dideoxyadenosine (ddA)", pages 4780-4785 | Examination | - M. MANSURI et al. "Pre- paration of 1-(2,3-Dideoxy- -Beta-D-glycero-pent-2- - enofuranosyl)thymine (d4T)1 and 2',3'-Dideoxyadenosine (ddA)", pages 4780-4785 |