EP0521351 - Pop-out viewfinder for compact camera with flip-up flash unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.09.1995 [1995/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burnham, William L., c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY Patent Department 343 State Street Rochester New York 14650 / US | [1993/01] | Representative(s) | Blickle, K. Werner, et al KODAK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Patentabteilung 70323 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | Blickle, K. Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al KODAK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Patentabteilung D-70323 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 92110323.0 | 19.06.1992 | [1993/01] | Priority number, date | US19910726100 | 05.07.1991 Original published format: US 726100 | [1993/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0521351 | Date: | 07.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0521351 | Date: | 21.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G03B17/04, G03B13/06 | [1993/01] | CPC: |
G03B13/06 (EP,US);
G03B15/05 (EP,US);
G03B17/04 (EP,US);
G03B2215/0507 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/01] | Title | German: | Herausspringender Sucher für eine Kompaktkamera mit aufklappbarer Blitzeinheit | [1993/01] | English: | Pop-out viewfinder for compact camera with flip-up flash unit | [1993/01] | French: | Viseur éjectable pour un appareil photographique à unité de flash relevable | [1993/01] | Examination procedure | 08.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/32] | 15.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5005032 (BURNHAM WILLIAM L [US]); | [A]US4350520 (BECK GUNTHER, et al); | [AD]US4996548 (SCHAPPLER JOSEPH J [US], et al); | [AD]US4983999 (MEISEZAHL WILLIAM J [US], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, P field, vol. 5, no. 154, September 29, 1981 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT page 100 P 82 |