Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0520333
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
27.06.2008 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] |
05.03.1999 |
Opposition rejected |
published on 21.04.1999 [1999/16] |
18.11.1998 |
Opposition rejected |
|
18.09.1998 |
Communication of examination report in opposition |
|
13.07.1998 |
Communication of examination report in opposition |
|
12.03.1998 |
Communication of examination report in opposition |
|
11.03.1997 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
16.01.1997 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
24.08.1996 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
02.08.1996 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 18.09.1996 [1996/38] |
01.08.1996 |
Unpublished change to opponent data |
|
12.07.1996 |
Opposition filed |
published on 28.08.1996 [1996/35] |
11.07.1996 |
Unpublished change to opponent data |
|
18.08.1995 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 04.10.1995 [1995/40] |
03.01.1995 |
First examination report |
|
05.01.1994 |
Change - representative |
published on 23.02.1994 [1994/08] |
24.06.1993 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.08.1993 [1993/32] |
13.11.1992 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 30.12.1992 [1992/53] |