Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0520333 | Global Dossier | 04.10.1995 | B1 | EP0520333 | 30.12.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4121430 | 28.06.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE4121430 | 05.11.1992 | C1 | Priority number | Date | DE4121430 | 28.06.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59203881D1 | 09.11.1995 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE4121430 | 28.06.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5332369 | 26.07.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4121430 | 28.06.1991 |