Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
21.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.1996 [1996/32] |
30.06.1995 | (Expected) grant | published on 16.08.1995 [1995/33] |
11.04.1994 | First examination report | |
25.02.1993 | Request for examination filed | published on 14.04.1993 [1993/15] |
11.12.1992 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.01.1993 [1993/04] |