Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0524446 | Global Dossier | 16.08.1995 | B1 | EP0524446 | 27.01.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE9108952 | 20.07.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE126560T | 15.09.1995 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE9108952 | 20.07.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59203278D1 | 21.09.1995 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE9108952 | 20.07.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE9108952U | 12.09.1991 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE9108952 | 20.07.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2034151 | 30.04.1995 | C1 | Priority number | Date | DE9108952 | 20.07.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5259130 | 09.11.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | DE9108952 | 20.07.1991 |