EP0575658 - Shift system having a manual speed selecting mechanism for a vehicular automatic transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1999 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AISIN AW CO., LTD. 10, Takane Fujii-cho Anjo-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/44] | For all designated states AISIN AW CO., LTD. 10, Takane Fujii-cho Anjo-shi Aichi-ken / JP | ||
Former [1993/52] | For all designated states AISIN AW CO., LTD. 10, Takane Fujiicho Anjo-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moroto, Shuzo 72-2 Nabeyama, Narumi-cho, Midori-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Hattori, Masashi 4-1, Kameyamasita, Anjo-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Ohara, Shigekazu 5,11-banchi, 1-chome, Honbayashi, Yata-cho Chirya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [1993/52] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/52] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92110866.8 | 26.06.1992 | [1993/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0575658 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0575658 | Date: | 28.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F16H59/02, F16H59/04 | [1993/52] | CPC: |
F16H59/10 (EP,US);
F16H59/0204 (EP,US);
F16H59/044 (EP,US);
F16H2059/006 (EP,US);
F16H2059/0265 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20067 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20098 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/52] | Title | German: | Schaltanlage mit manuellem Übersetzungswahlmechanismus für ein automatisches Kraftfahrzeuggetriebe | [1993/52] | English: | Shift system having a manual speed selecting mechanism for a vehicular automatic transmission | [1993/52] | French: | Système de changement de vitesse comportant un mécanisme de sélection manuelle de vitesse pour une transmission automatique de véhicule | [1993/52] | Examination procedure | 24.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/34] | 24.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 29.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 28.10.1998 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/36] | FR | 26.03.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0413116 (PORSCHE AG [DE]); | [A]FR2437315 (DEERE & CO [US]); | [A]US4326432 (MILLER DOUGLAS A); | [A]DE4035713 (AISIN AW CO [JP]); | [AD]EP0331797 |