EP0522401 - Enamel slip, process for enamelling aluminised steel plate and enamelled steel plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.1994 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.12.1994 [1994/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Email Brügge N.V. Pathoekeweg 116 B-8000 Brügge / BE | [1993/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Preuss, Leo, Dipl.-Ing. Zeedijk 7 B-8380 Zeebrugge / BE | 02 /
Hoffmann, Hans, Dr. Moerstraat 38 B-8000 Brugge / BE | [1993/02] | Representative(s) | Müller, Gerhard BAYER AG Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/02] | Müller, Gerhard, Dr. BAYER AG Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 92110963.3 | 29.06.1992 | [1993/02] | Priority number, date | DE19914122763 | 10.07.1991 Original published format: DE 4122763 | [1993/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0522401 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C03C8/14, C23D5/02 | [1993/02] | CPC: |
C23D5/02 (EP,US);
C03C8/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1993/02] | Title | German: | Emailschlicker, Verfahren zur Emaillierung von aluminium-beschichtetem Stahlblech sowie emailliertes Stahlblech | [1993/02] | English: | Enamel slip, process for enamelling aluminised steel plate and enamelled steel plate | [1993/02] | French: | Barbotine d'émail, procédé d'émaillage d'un tôle en acier aluminiséet tôle en acier aluminisé | [1993/02] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 28.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/12] | 15.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP60197885 ; | [A]JP61091040 ; | [YP]EP0453897 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [Y]US4147835 (NISHINO ATSUSHI, et al); | [Y]FR2400876 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]FR2565224 (URALSKY INST CHERNYKH METALL [SU]) | [Y] - DATABASE WPIL Section Ch, Week 8546, 1985 Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class L, AN 85-287314 & JP-A-60 197 885 (NGK INSULATORS) 7. Oktober 1985, & JP60197885 A 00000000 | [A] - DATABASE WPIL Section Ch, Week 8625, 1986 Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class L, AN 86-158725 & JP-A-61 091 040 (NIPPON FRIT) 9. Mai 1986, & JP61091040 A 00000000 |