EP0523438 - Microcomputer with boundary-scan facility [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.01.1999 [1999/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [1993/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bron, Michel Simplon 3B CH-1006 Lausanne / CH | 02 /
McGinn, Peter 8 Moorcroft Road Newton Mearns, Glasgow Scotland / GB | [1993/03] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/03] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Motorola, European Intellectual Property, Midpoint, Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 92110978.1 | 29.06.1992 | [1993/03] | Priority number, date | GB19910015097 | 12.07.1991 Original published format: GB 9115097 | [1993/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0523438 | Date: | 20.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0523438 | Date: | 24.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0523438 | Date: | 04.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/26 | [1993/03] | CPC: |
G06F11/2236 (EP);
G06F11/27 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1993/03] | Title | German: | Mikrorechner mit "Boundary-Scan"-Gerät | [1993/03] | English: | Microcomputer with boundary-scan facility | [1993/03] | French: | Microcalculatrice avec un dispositif de "Boundary-scan" | [1993/03] | Examination procedure | 28.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/25] | 23.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - HARWOOD W., MCDERMOTT M., "TESTABILITY FEATURES OF THE MC68332 MODULAR MICROCONTROLLER.", MEETING THE TESTS OF TIME. WASHINGTON, AUG. 29 - 31, 1989., WASHINGTON, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS., US, US, (19890829), vol. CONF. 20, ISBN 978-0-8186-8962-8, pages 615 - 623., XP000089992 | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL TEST CONFERENCE 1987 3 September 1987, SHERATON HOTEL, WASHINGTON, DC pages 810 - 817 W. R. OLSON ET AL. 'Implementing Built-In Self-Test in a RISC Microprocessor' |