EP0576703 - Transmission control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.10.1996 [1996/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/01] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Graf, Friedrich, Dipl.-Ing. Amselweg 5 W-8400 Regensburg / DE | 02 /
Probst, Gregor, Dipl.-Ing. Dreisesselstrasse 15 W-8300 Landshut / DE | 03 /
Weil, Hans-Greorg, Dipl.-Ing. Wangenerstrasse 64 W-8130 Starnberg / DE | [1994/01] | Application number, filing date | 92111076.3 | 30.06.1992 | [1994/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0576703 | Date: | 05.01.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0576703 | Date: | 02.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/02 | [1994/01] | CPC: |
F16H61/16 (EP,US);
F16H61/0213 (EP,US);
B60T2220/02 (EP,US);
B60W2050/0057 (EP,US);
B60W2520/125 (EP,US);
B60W2540/30 (EP,US);
B60W40/09 (EP,US);
F16H2059/003 (EP,US);
F16H2059/506 (EP,US);
F16H2061/0081 (EP,US);
F16H2061/0096 (EP,US);
F16H59/24 (EP,US);
F16H59/48 (EP,US);
F16H59/54 (EP,US);
F16H59/66 (EP,US);
Y10S706/90 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/08] |
Former [1994/01] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Getriebesteuerung | [1994/01] | English: | Transmission control | [1994/01] | French: | Commande de transmission | [1994/01] | Examination procedure | 01.07.1993 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, GR, LI, LU, MC, NL | 19.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/12] | 07.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.08.1993 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.1993 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.1993 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.1993 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.1993 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.1993 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.1993 | LI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.1993 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.1993 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.1993 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.1993 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.1993 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP03121354 ; | [A]JP02212655 ; | [AD]DE3341652 (PORSCHE AG [DE]); | [A]DE4112577 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [Y]EP0471102 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 321 (M-1147)(4849) 15. August 1991 & JP-A-03 121 354 ( TOYOTA ), & JP03121354 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 514 (M-1046)(4457) 13. November 1990 & JP-A-02 212 655 ( NISSAN ), & JP02212655 A 00000000 |