EP0521517 - Process for producing an ink jet recording head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/01] | Ink jet recording head, process for producing the head and ink jet recording apparatus | ||
[1998/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1999 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Junichi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kobayashi, Masatsune, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Arai, Ryuichi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Shimomura, Akihiko, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Kashiwazaki, Akio, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1993/01] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92111295.9 | 03.07.1992 | [1993/01] | Priority number, date | JP19910165413 | 05.07.1991 Original published format: JP 16541391 | JP19910284674 | 30.10.1991 Original published format: JP 28467491 | [1993/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0521517 | Date: | 07.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0521517 | Date: | 02.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0521517 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/16 | [1993/01] | CPC: |
B41J2/1642 (EP,US);
B41J2/1604 (EP,US);
B41J2/1623 (EP,US);
B41J2/1626 (EP,US);
B41J2/1631 (EP,US);
B41J2/1632 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1993/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Farbstrahlaufzeichnungskopfes | [1998/22] | English: | Process for producing an ink jet recording head | [1998/22] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'une tête d'enregistrement à jet d'encre | [1998/22] |
Former [1993/01] | Farbstrahlaufzeichnungskopf, Verfahren zur Herstellung des Kopfes und Farbstrahlaufzeichnungsgerät | ||
Former [1993/01] | Ink jet recording head, process for producing the head and ink jet recording apparatus | ||
Former [1993/01] | Tête d'enregistrement à jet d'encre, procédé pour la fabrication de la tête et appareil d'enregistrement à jet d'encre | Examination procedure | 19.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/50] | 18.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.05.1998 | BE | 27.05.1998 | CH | 27.05.1998 | GR | 27.05.1998 | LI | 27.05.1998 | NL | 27.05.1998 | LU | 03.07.1998 | DK | 27.08.1998 | PT | 27.08.1998 | SE | 27.08.1998 | [2004/38] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 27.05.1998 | |
BE | 27.05.1998 | ||
CH | 27.05.1998 | ||
GR | 27.05.1998 | ||
LI | 27.05.1998 | ||
NL | 27.05.1998 | ||
LU | 31.07.1998 | ||
DK | 27.08.1998 | ||
PT | 27.08.1998 | ||
SE | 27.08.1998 | ||
Former [2003/07] | AT | 27.05.1998 | |
BE | 27.05.1998 | ||
CH | 27.05.1998 | ||
GR | 27.05.1998 | ||
LI | 27.05.1998 | ||
NL | 27.05.1998 | ||
LU | 31.07.1998 | ||
PT | 27.08.1998 | ||
SE | 27.08.1998 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 27.05.1998 | |
BE | 27.05.1998 | ||
CH | 27.05.1998 | ||
GR | 27.05.1998 | ||
LI | 27.05.1998 | ||
LU | 31.07.1998 | ||
PT | 27.08.1998 | ||
SE | 27.08.1998 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 27.05.1998 | |
BE | 27.05.1998 | ||
GR | 27.05.1998 | ||
LU | 31.07.1998 | ||
PT | 27.08.1998 | ||
SE | 27.08.1998 | ||
CH | 01.09.1998 | ||
LI | 01.09.1998 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 27.05.1998 | |
BE | 27.05.1998 | ||
GR | 27.05.1998 | ||
LU | 31.07.1998 | ||
PT | 27.08.1998 | ||
SE | 27.08.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | AT | 27.05.1998 | |
BE | 27.05.1998 | ||
PT | 27.08.1998 | ||
SE | 27.08.1998 | ||
Former [1999/27] | AT | 27.05.1998 | |
BE | 27.05.1998 | ||
SE | 27.08.1998 | ||
Former [1999/01] | AT | 27.05.1998 | |
SE | 27.08.1998 | ||
Former [1998/47] | SE | 27.08.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4437100 (SUGITANI HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [X]EP0231790 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]); | [X] - JOU J. H., HSU L., CHANG L. S., "AN ANALYSIS OF THERMAL STRESSES IN A MULTILAYER THIN FILM PRINTHEAD.", THIN SOLID FILMS, ELSEVIER-SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE., CH, CH, (19910630), vol. 201., no. 02., doi:10.1016/0040-6090(91)90115-E, ISSN 0040-6090, pages 253 - 265., XP000231086 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-6090(91)90115-E | [X] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN vol. 21, no. 1, June 1978, pages 307 - 307 MISSEL 'BONDING INK JET NOZZLE PLATES TO BASE PLATES' | Examination | US4657631 |