EP0525439 - Brake disc [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.10.1995 [1995/43] | Applicant(s) | For:ES
FR
GB
IT
PT
SE
Linde AG Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | For:DE
AUDI AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | For:ES
FR
GB
IT
PT
SE
Linde Aktiengesellschaft Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 D-65189 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
For:DE
AUDI AG D-85045 Ingolstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heinrich, Peter Ritter-von-Halt-Strasse 5 W-8034 Germering / DE | 02 /
Heck, Klaus Krumenauerstrasse 4 W-8070 Ingolstadt / DE | [1993/05] | Representative(s) | Schaefer, Gerhard Linde Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | Schaefer, Gerhard, Dr. Linde Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung D-82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | Application number, filing date | 92111338.7 | 03.07.1992 | [1993/05] | Priority number, date | DE19914125064 | 29.07.1991 Original published format: DE 4125064 | [1993/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0525439 | Date: | 03.02.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0525439 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/12 | [1993/05] | CPC: |
F16D65/125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, PT, SE [1993/05] | Title | German: | Bremsscheibe | [1993/05] | English: | Brake disc | [1993/05] | French: | Disque de frein | [1993/05] | Examination procedure | 19.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/16] | 24.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0419684 (ZAPOROZH AVTOMOBIL [SU], et al); | [A]US2747701 (NEWELL GEORGE K); | [A]DE2254653 ; | [A]WO8000736 (GOODRICH CO B F [US]) | [A] - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED, SECTION P/Q,WEEK E18, 16 JUIN 1982. DERWENT PUBLICATIONS LTD., LONDON, GB. | [A] - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED SECTION III-MECHANICAL } GENERAL, DECEMBER 1971 DERWENT PUBLICATIONS LTD., LONDON. GB. |